Governance THE NATIONAL CHILDBIRTH TRUST

Charity number: 801395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 24 April 1989: Standard registration
  • 10 July 2013: Funds received from 1110358 THE BABY CAFE CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 04 June 2015: Funds received from 295346 MIDWIVES INFORMATION AND RESOURCE SERVICE
  • 30 October 2019: Funds received from 1172175 BENEFIT BREASTFEEDING
  • 24 June 2020: Funds received from 1057609 ST MARK'S PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • N C T (Working name)
  • NCT (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property