Dogfen lywodraethu THE NATIONAL CHILDBIRTH TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/04/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/07/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/06/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2015 as amended on 13 Oct 2018 as amended on 08 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: 1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF PREGNANT WOMEN BY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT DURING PREGNANCY AND CHILDBIRTH; 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF PARENTS AND THEIR CHILDREN DURING THE POST-NATAL PERIOD; AND 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS IN CHILDBIRTH AND PARENTHOOD.
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.