Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF BOSWELLS SCHOOL

Charity number: 801420
Charity reporting is overdue by 142 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 February 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 April 2021 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 March 2020 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required