THE FRIENDS OF BOSWELLS SCHOOL

Charity number: 801420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.27k £4.58k £5.47k £9.27k £9.66k
Total expenditure £8.84k £3.96k £6.89k £8.20k £7.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A