THE BRIXTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of facilities at Brixton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 16 August 1989: Standard registration
- B C A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sylvie Cairo | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|||||
anthony john parish | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
LIZ HITCHINS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.85k | £0 | £5.34k | £6.89k | £7.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.81k | £1.35k | £3.97k | £4.61k | £4.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH JULY 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BRIXTON IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX SEXUAL ORIENTATION RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION ANDLEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MENAVAUR
BRIXTON
PLYMOUTH
PL8 2AG
- Phone:
- 01752881424
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window