TRETHURGY SOCIAL HALL

Charity number: 801612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 January 2021 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 14 January 2020 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 14 January 2019 09 March 2020 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 14 January 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 14 January 2017 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 January 2017 Not Required