TRETHURGY SOCIAL HALL

Charity number: 801612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 14/01/2017 14/01/2018 14/01/2019 14/01/2020 14/01/2021
Total gross income £6.17k £5.49k £6.05k £7.42k £1.50k
Total expenditure £4.18k £4.58k £7.48k £4.73k £2.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A