Accounts and annual returns 198 CONTEMPORARY ARTS AND LEARNING LTD

Charity number: 801614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window