Trustees BASILDON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 801684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Jeffrey Petty | Chair | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Retigan | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joe Louis Coward | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
DIANE BROWN | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Nicola O'Connor | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Karan Sage | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Flack | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Reece William Pounder | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Batman | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adam Coles | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Cambridge | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gary Brown | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.