ORTHODOX PARISH OF ST JOHN OF KRONSTADT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious education & training. The Parish provides care & counselling services, advocacy, advice and information. Beneficiary groups include the general public/mankind, children and young people, the elderly and senior citizens. Widcombe, BNES is our main geographical area of benefit, along with a worldwide presence through our international links and web site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 13 July 1989: Standard registration
- ORTHODOX PARISH OF ST JOHN KRONSTADT (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Penwell | Trustee |
|
||||||
FATHER SERAPHIM JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN BATES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SISTER SARAH OVERTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.76k | £34.30k | £48.99k | £26.18k | £26.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.35k | £28.42k | £39.48k | £31.44k | £29.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 15 July 2020 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2019
(These accounts |
15 July 2020 | 166 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH JUNE 1989 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 30TH MARCH 2004 AND BY MEMORANDUM DATED 20 APRIL 2004, AND 7 NOVEMBER 2004. AS AMENDED ON 03 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN RELIGION. BY PROCURING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A PARISH OR PARISHES OF PERSONS AT BATH, AVON OR ELSEWHERE AND BY PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING A KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE THEOLOGY, SPIRITUALITY, LITURGICAL ARTS AND LIFE OF THE ORTHODOX CHURCH AMONG BOTH ORTHODOX AND NON ORTHODOX CHRISTIANS AND AMONG AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE.
Area of benefit
BATH, AVON AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Avenue Road
TROWBRIDGE
Wiltshire
BA14 0AQ
- Phone:
- 07727408157
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window