THE SOUTH WEST YMCA TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the general purpose of the work of the Young Men's Christian Association Movement for the physical, intellectual and spiritual, fitness, training and well being of youth in accordance with the rules and principles adopted by the National Council of YMCAs area of benifit being South West England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Gloucestershire
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 04 July 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL REISBACH | Chair | 25 May 2020 |
|
|||||
ERNEST NICHOLAS EDGCUMBE | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WILSON | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
NEIL LINDSAY FOSTER | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA GILBERT | Trustee | 24 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS MAGGIE A KING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.60k | £22.25k | £29.56k | £13.01k | £15.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.75k | £13.84k | £10.14k | £15.44k | £23.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13/05/1989 AS AMENDED ON 20/11/2006 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/2015 as amended on 19 May 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROMOTING THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE WORK OF THE YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION MOVEMENT FOR THE PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL AND SPIRITUAL FITNESS TRAINING AND WELL BEING OF YOUTH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RULES AND PRINCIPLES FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVED AND ADOPTED BY THE NATIONAL COUNCIL OF YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS (INCORPORATED) OR SUCH BODY AS SHALL BE FROM TIME TO TIME THE PRINCIPAL AUTHORITY OF THE YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND HAVING REGARD TO ANY SPECIAL NEEDS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS HEREINAFTER DEFINED AND FOR USE THEREIN WHICH MAY ARISE WITH THE VARYING CIRCUMSTANCES OF FUTURE TIMES. (THE AREA OF BENEFIT MEANS BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET, THE CITY OF BRISTOL, CORNWALL, DEVON, GLOUCESTERSHIRE NORTH SOMERSET, SOMERSET, SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE).
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Summerhouse
22 Gloucester Road
Almondsbury
BRISTOL
BS32 4AD
- Phone:
- 07855424495
- Email:
- CLARE_JEFFERIS@YAHOO.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window