THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST'S CHURCH, LAYER-DE-LA-HAYE

Charity number: 801763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 June 2017 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required