Financial history THE SAFE START FOUNDATION

Charity number: 801815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £140.10k £127.88k £119.77k £292.03k £135.38k
Total expenditure £246.97k £221.55k £240.66k £224.04k £169.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £3.43k £72.67k