THE COVERDALE TRUST - SUPPORTING CHRISTIAN ARTISTS INTERNATIONALLY

Charity number: 801913
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

29 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 24 August 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 17 January 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)