THE COVERDALE TRUST - SUPPORTING CHRISTIAN ARTISTS INTERNATIONALLY

Charity number: 801913
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £31.54k £34.71k £30.80k £16.03k £19.84k
Total expenditure £26.55k £30.80k £30.59k £18.21k £10.74k