THE RICK KEELING MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 801943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 04 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 16 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 18 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 07 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required