THE RICK KEELING MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 801943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides annual awards to be awarded to one or more students at Thurston Community College in recognition of outstanding merit beyond the academic curriculum.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £928
Total expenditure: £200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 August 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD SPERRIN FAWCETT Chair
None on record
Paul Roy Potter Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
David John Ford Trustee
JOHN WRENN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE DRINKSTONE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THOMAS CAMBORNE
Received: On time
STEWART CHENERY Trustee
None on record
IAN RICHARD TOULSON Trustee
None on record
JEAN ALEXIS WHEELER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £980 £1.21k £851 £1.03k £928
Total expenditure £0 £0 £3.05k £0 £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 27 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 06 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 04 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 16 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Glenrose
Gedding Road
Drinkstone
Drinkstone Green
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP30 9TD
Phone:
01449737829
Website:

No information available