THE FRIENDS OF MOUNT VERNON CENTRE FOR CANCER TREATMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 16 August 1989: Standard registration
- 17 December 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE FRIENDS OF MOUNT VERNON TUMOUR AND RADIOTHERAPY CENTRE AT MOUNT VERNON HOSPITAL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.02k | £23.84k | £9.15k | £25.89k | £46.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.14k | £3.91k | £59.08k | £21.63k | £95.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 25 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 19 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 19 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 19 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 25 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 25 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 28 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 28 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 11 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 23 January 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH MAY 1989 AS AMENDED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS OF THE TUMOUR & RADIOTHERAPY CENTRE AT MOUNT VERNON CENTRE FOR CANCER TREATMENT WHO ARE SICK AND GENERALLY SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID CENTRE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window