THE AL-KHOEI BENEVOLENT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 802000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 04 October 2018 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 04 October 2018 96 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 August 2017 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 25 August 2017 56 days late Download