THE AL-KHOEI BENEVOLENT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 802000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.89m £6.92m £6.84m £5.62m £3.16m
Total expenditure £3.26m £6.98m £7.24m £6.44m £2.91m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £432.28k
Income - Donations and legacies £257.48k £5.32m £5.09m £3.78m £1.20m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.63m £1.57m £1.75m £1.84m £1.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £388 £69 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £20.07k £1.57k £246 £291.79k
Income - Legacies £257.48k £5.32m £5.09m £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.15m £6.87m £7.07m £6.33m £2.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £107.81k £106.11k £163.34k £117.74k £0
Expenditure - Governance £316.44k £425.71k £321.66k £393.58k £308.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £5.04m £4.25m £879.79k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0