ST GEORGE'S COMMUNITY CHILDREN'S PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 802017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hayley Rebecca Ford Trustee 15 January 2020 None on record
ADRIAN CROUCH Chair None on record
Laura Kate Gueran Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
Julie Hughes Trustee 14 April 2020 None on record
Lindsey Grant Trustee 18 August 2015 None on record
Anna Youngson Trustee 31 March 2021 None on record
INGRID BUSSELL Trustee 13 December 2013 None on record
Pauline Parker Trustee 09 February 2016 None on record
James Lowel Trustee 21 February 2020 None on record
CENYDD MILNE Trustee None on record
Jason Fisher Trustee 23 August 2015 None on record
Steven Whittle Trustee 08 October 2018 None on record