BLETCHINGLEY CHURCH WARDENS FUND

Charity number: 802018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 08 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 20 December 2018 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required