THE W H AND A HAWKINS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 802022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £138.84k £131.64k £121.82k £144.19k £88.50k
Total expenditure £117.76k £189.86k £207.33k £138.56k £127.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A