THE SOCIETY OF THE WORK

Charity number: 802099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 May 2017 On time Download