Dogfen lywodraethu THE SOCIETY OF MUSCULOSKELETAL MEDICINE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/11/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/01/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN RELIEVING SICKNESS BY PROMOTING AND ADVANCING THE USE STUDY AND SCIENCE OF ORTHOPAEDIC MEDICINE AND BY PROVIDING FACILIES FOR TREATMENT EDUCATION STUDY AND RESEARCH THEREIN. TH USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH SHALL BE DISSEMINATED.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.