Accounts and annual returns THE CHICHESTER MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 802173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required