Financial history THE CHICHESTER MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 802173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £16.26k £20.98k £21.44k £39.15k £34.35k
Total expenditure £13.20k £33.21k £15.71k £51.93k £19.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £23.60k £16.30k