Trustees BRITISH EXPLORING SOCIETY
Charity number: 802196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Greasley | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Selmes | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Smith | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Walton | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Mark Passingham | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Christopher Fawcett | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Royston | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Hopkinson | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Frank Tilston | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rahul Nath Moodgal | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Young | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.