RURAL MISSION SOLUTIONS LTD

Charity number: 802305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required