ELY CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society aims to promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of choral music in all its aspects. The activities to support the above are the presentation of public performances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 21 November 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jeremy Richard James | Chair | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Grace | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elizabeth Ogden | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angela Elizabeth Major | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vere Elizabeth Burton | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Valerie Rogers | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Colin Robert Batchelor | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Charles Clarke Brunt | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Every | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Roger Anthony Young | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.46k | £23.93k | £10.57k | £22.24k | £32.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.27k | £20.47k | £11.59k | £24.90k | £37.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/02/1989 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/1989 AS AMENDED ON 08/10/2012
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS. 2. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Downham Road
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB6 1AH
- Phone:
- 01353666726
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window