Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF STONE LODGE ACADEMY

Charity number: 802354
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 July 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required