Financial history FRIENDS OF STONE LODGE ACADEMY

Charity number: 802354
Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £1.67k £8.31k £7.80k £4.68k £2.94k
Total expenditure £486 £8.00k £6.74k £1.76k £2.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A