GRAVESEND EPILEPSY NETWORK

Charity number: 802373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 14 January 2020 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 24 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 May 2017 On time Download