GRAVESEND EPILEPSY NETWORK

Charity number: 802373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £198.26k £1.35k £1.59k £5.95k £4.67k
Total expenditure £203.02k £2.08k £1.56k £4.22k £4.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A