REACT

Charity number: 802440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 September 2016 On time Download