REACT

Charity number: 802440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £744.46k £871.59k £844.51k £665.49k £999.27k
Total expenditure £776.22k £693.93k £717.43k £733.84k £784.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £698.36k £787.29k £729.87k £570.92k £949.32k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £80.92k £7.38k £8.72k £47.28k
Income - Endowments £0 £250.00k £32.50k £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.33k £3.39k £4.23k £3.31k £2.68k
Income - Other £42.77k £0 £103.04k £82.53k £0
Income - Legacies £7.21k £254.71k £132.50k £0 £252.18k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £617.57k £510.51k £559.52k £620.60k £632.85k
Expenditure - Raising funds £158.65k £183.42k £157.40k £110.73k £151.49k
Expenditure - Governance £8.48k £2.30k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £513 £2.51k £0