INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE TRUST

Charity number: 802450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 October 2016 On time Download