INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE TRUST

Charity number: 802450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £764.99k £984.97k £602.33k £569.84k £550.70k
Total expenditure £633.17k £717.18k £754.03k £711.58k £603.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £763.45k £984.35k £601.75k £569.02k £549.88k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.54k £615 £577 £825 £821
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £134.57k -£6.73k £57.51k £82.20k £15.60k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £522.65k £611.65k £611.88k £608.76k £499.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds £110.52k £105.53k £142.14k £102.82k £103.58k
Expenditure - Governance £6.67k £7.62k £7.37k £10.15k £8.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution £323.19k £408.49k £394.73k £423.15k £314.90k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0