INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE TRUST

Charity number: 802450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon David Matthews Trustee 08 June 2017
OURBRAINBANK Recently registered
Gareth Hughes Trustee 06 March 2019 None on record
Charlotte Lisa Zamboni Trustee 08 June 2017 None on record
Steven Lister Trustee 11 December 2018 None on record
Stephen Rhys Williams Trustee 14 June 2017 None on record
Jeff Holland Trustee 11 December 2018
HUMEN Received: On time
Robert George McCrea Trustee 09 June 2017 None on record
James Emerson Chair 23 January 2019 None on record
Alexandra Theis Trustee 11 December 2018 None on record