THE NZ-UK LINK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 802457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £29.28k £15.88k £1.41k £741 £5.90k
Total expenditure £152.23k £144.43k £60.47k £58.12k £13.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A