THE BRACECAMP PARISH HALL

Charity number: 802460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £9.72k £10.75k £9.80k £10.57k £6.37k
Total expenditure £7.12k £8.00k £12.34k £9.29k £12.18k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A