Accounts and annual returns GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST CHARALAMBOUS

Charity number: 802532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 05 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 05 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 01 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 08 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 08 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 19 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 19 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 12 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window