JEWISH CARE

Charity number: 802559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £52.71m £56.09m £63.73m £61.49m £62.03m
Total expenditure £50.15m £52.85m £55.81m £56.33m £61.36m
Income from government contracts £13.60m £14.89m £12.16m £12.50m £12.65m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £53.73k £7.50k £121.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £20.30m £18.75m £25.02m £26.82m £25.56m
Income - Other trading activities £144.00k £129.00k £134.00k £155.00k £70.00k
Income - Charitable activities £31.22m £31.91m £31.36m £33.31m £34.97m
Income - Endowments £269.00k £16.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.05m £1.02m £1.11m £1.15m £1.02m
Income - Other £0 £4.29m £6.11m £65.00k £421.00k
Income - Legacies £3.49m £7.05m £6.09m £5.29m £4.62m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £46.30m £49.35m £50.37m £52.61m £57.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.85m £3.50m £3.42m £3.69m £3.81m
Expenditure - Governance £408.00k £359.00k £393.00k £509.00k £498.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £92.02k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £215.00k £267.00k £89.00k £185.00k £190.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £2.02m £33.00k £520.00k