JEWISH CARE

Charity number: 802559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Weiner Trustee 14 December 2016 None on record
Jonathan Rose Trustee 22 March 2021 None on record
Harold Gittelmon Trustee 05 November 2018
GRIEF ENCOUNTER Received: On time
CAMP SIMCHA Received: On time
ARNOLD WAGNER OBE Trustee None on record
Leah Hurst Trustee 14 September 2020 None on record
Adam Dawson Trustee 05 November 2018 None on record
MICHAEL BRODTMAN Trustee 30 April 2013 None on record
SIMON FRIEND Trustee 26 September 2016
THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ARTS Received: On time
Jonathan Zenios Chair 01 March 2020
THE JEWISH LEADERSHIP COUNCIL Received: On time
Marcus Sperber Trustee 22 November 2021 None on record
Julia Bekhor Trustee 05 November 2018 None on record
Gayle Klein Trustee 26 September 2016 None on record