THE STOWMARKET CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 802571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required