Accounts and annual returns ST ELIZABETH'S SCHOOL, RICHMOND PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 802577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 28 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window