ST ELIZABETH'S SCHOOL, RICHMOND PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 802577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £78.23k £68.64k £66.43k £56.36k £22.38k
Total expenditure £23.55k £22.28k £17.62k £17.45k £9.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A