THE LINTON ZOO CONSERVATION FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of talks and activities promoting awarenes for schools and visitors to Linton Zoo. Development and production of environmental education material including signs, posters and newsletters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 12 February 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Hillyard | Trustee | 03 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Jean Simmons | Trustee | 13 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
KIM CHERYL SIMMONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.27k | £36.32k | £26.58k | £8.99k | £9.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.35k | £27.09k | £9.73k | £13.98k | £21.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE BREEDING OF RARE ANIMALS BIRDS AND REPTILES AT LINTON ZOO AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HORSESHOE COTTAGE
HADSTOCK ROAD
LINTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB21 4NT
- Phone:
- 01223891308
- Email:
- lintonzoo@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window