H Y P HOLIDAYS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising holidays for disabled persons and carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 11 January 1990: Standard registration
- 01 March 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.14k | £3.36k | £4.50k | £5.80k | £5.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £723 | £11.10k | £10.42k | £8.43k | £6.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 29 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 14 July 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 06 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 15 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST DECEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE HANDICAPPED PERSONS RESIDENT OF ENGLAND AND OVERSEAS BY THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS AND HOLIDAY ACCOMMODATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS AND QUALITY OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window