Accounts and annual returns THE HANWELL AND EALING OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 802791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 08 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 18 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 07 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 07 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 12 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 12 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window